U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Sack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Release from Custody]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 04, 2019: [Furlough]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 29, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Request]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Request]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.