U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arciniega
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 14, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Request]
  • July 25, 2019: [Request]
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.