U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tingle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extend]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.