U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 07, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 20, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Psychiatric Treatment]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • September 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 13, 2020: [Release from Custody]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.