U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Starr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 16, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.