U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Florez-Barba
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Response]
  • July 29, 2019: [Request]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 29, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • July 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.