U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 22, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2019: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.