U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Means
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • May 12, 2022: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • May 03, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.