U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Funez-Soler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • October 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Request]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.