U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas-Luna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arrest]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.