U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 16, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 13, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Request]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arrest]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.