U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vazquez-Casas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arrest]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.