U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamaker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 09, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Request]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.