U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 21, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2019: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.