U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2021: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 01, 2019: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Seal Case]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.