U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Request]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.