U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 15, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 16, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • May 12, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Quash]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Request]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Request]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • July 29, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.