U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bond Posted]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 06, 2019: [Request]
  • August 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 01, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Request]
  • July 30, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 29, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 29, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Request]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.