U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 09, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 09, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 12, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 12, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 11, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 12, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.