U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Metcalf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.