U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 14, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 14, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 14, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.