U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:90-cr-40028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saffeels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Old FRC Case Documents]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.