U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Response]
  • August 12, 2019: [Request]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.