U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ismail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 11, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 07, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 01, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 30, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 26, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2020: [Request]
  • March 18, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 03, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.