U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valentine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extend]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Response]
  • July 08, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Certificate]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Declaration]
  • February 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 01, 2021: [Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • November 29, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 28, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 25, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 25, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 25, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 03, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 01, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • May 27, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 25, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 25, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [New Trial]
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 28, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 25, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [New Trial]
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • February 18, 2021: [Verdict]
  • February 18, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • February 18, 2021: [Response to Jury Question]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 18, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • February 18, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury List]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 15, 2021: [Response]
  • February 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 11, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • February 10, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 09, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 08, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 05, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 02, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Jury List]
  • February 02, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: [For Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 06, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.