U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petersdorf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 14, 2019: [Request]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 13, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.