U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fanning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2019: [Request]
  • August 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.