U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Request]
  • September 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 03, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Request]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Arrest]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.