U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lapointe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 22, 2019: [Request]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.