U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Joinder]
  • November 14, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • November 10, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • November 03, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Verdict]
  • October 28, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • October 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 28, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 25, 2022: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 24, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 24, 2022: [Jury List]
  • October 24, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 21, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 13, 2022: [Jury List]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 12, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2022: [Jury List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extend]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • October 07, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Supplement]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Joinder]
  • March 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Furlough]
  • October 22, 2021: [Furlough]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Joinder]
  • September 09, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Furlough]
  • August 10, 2021: [Furlough]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 04, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 14, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 08, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 07, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Joinder]
  • June 21, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 07, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 01, 2021: [Joinder]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 21, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2021: [Joinder]
  • May 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • May 14, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 12, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 12, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 07, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 06, 2021: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2021: [Declaration]
  • May 03, 2021: [In Limine]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 19, 2021: [Joinder]
  • April 19, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 16, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Response]
  • April 13, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 10, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 10, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 08, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2021: [Subpoena(s)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice]
  • April 05, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 05, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 05, 2021: [Produce ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Joinder]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extend]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Joinder]
  • November 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Subpoena(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2020: [Joinder]
  • May 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 20, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
  • January 09, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 06, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Suppress]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Joinder]
  • December 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 13, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 12, 2019: [Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 12, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Text Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 27, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2019: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 14, 2019: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.