U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medicine Crow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 28, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Request]
  • August 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 19, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2019: [Request]
  • August 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.