U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rajab
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • February 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 29, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 09, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 08, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • November 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 01, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • July 01, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Verdict]
  • December 11, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury List]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 22, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Request]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.