U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • October 04, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 29, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 06, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • June 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 14, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Request]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2019: [Request]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.