U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williamson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • July 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Request]
  • August 14, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.