U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gertsch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2023: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 13, 2020: [Forfeiture]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 19, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 12, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 14, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.