U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 01, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.