U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Talks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 16, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 02, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Furlough]
  • September 01, 2020: [Certificate]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 02, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Request]
  • September 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.