U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 29, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 20, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 18, 2019: [In Limine]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 09, 2019: [Request]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Request]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.