U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 05, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 12, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Request]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.