U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duque
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Request]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.