U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lumbardy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 05, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Evaluation]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 12, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.