U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sampson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 23, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Request]
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Request]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.