U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 01, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Bail Report]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Request]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Request]
  • June 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.