U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 11, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 25, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 25, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 25, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 24, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 02, 2020: [Furlough]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Verdict]
  • December 11, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury List]
  • December 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 02, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Request]
  • August 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Request]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.