U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extend]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 19, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 14, 2021: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Request]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2020: [Request]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.