U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 25, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 16, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • February 15, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 14, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 28, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 23, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2019: [Request]
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Request]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.