U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 11, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 03, 2021: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.