U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.