U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Request]
  • August 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.