U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kistler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 11, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 30, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 10, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 27, 2021: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 20, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 19, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 29, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 16, 2021: [Objection]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 05, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 18, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 13, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Request]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.